Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Félix del Blanco Prieto

Deceased

Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

Titular Archbishop of Vannida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1937Born
27 May 196123.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 199153.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vannida
31 May 199153.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
31 May 199153.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Angola
6 Jul 199154.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vannida
4 May 199658.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cameroun
28 Jun 199659.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea
5 Jun 200365.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
24 Jun 200366.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya
28 Jul 200770.1AppointedAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
3 Nov 201275.3RetiredAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
10 Apr 202183.8DiedAlmoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Félix del Blanco Prieto
Archbishop Félix del Blanco Prieto (born , died ) Almoner Emeritus of Papal Charities

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorgovejo, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, León, Diocese of León, Spain
Death PlacePoliclinco Gemelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r/ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,454
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2012
  • d: CB, 12 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Sep 2021

Quantcast