Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Henri René Jacqueline

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Morocco

Titular Archbishop of Abbir Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1918Born
30 Oct 194325.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Coutances (-Avranches), France
12 Mar 194425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances (-Avranches), France
24 Apr 198264.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abbir Maius
24 Apr 198264.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burundi
19 Jun 198264.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Abbir Maius
Oct 198567.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burundi
20 Mar 198668.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Morocco
22 May 199375.1RetiredApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Morocco
26 Feb 200788.9DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Morocco

MicroData Summary for Bernard Henri René Jacqueline (VIAF: 41841769)
Archbishop Bernard Henri René Jacqueline (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus of Morocco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Lô, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSaint-Lô, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast