Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques-Paul Cardinal Martin

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

Cardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1908Born
14 Oct 193426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nice, France
5 Jan 196455.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Neapolis in Palaestina
5 Jan 196455.3AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Feb 196455.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neapolis in Palaestina
9 Apr 196960.6AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
18 Dec 198678.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Palaestina
18 Dec 198678.3RetiredPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
28 Jun 198879.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
28 Jun 198879.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 199284.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Paul Martin
Jacques-Paul Cardinal Martin (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Prefecture of the Papal Household

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of Saint-Esprit, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Canons of St. Peter Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)"Reconciliazione" chapel, Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • op/c1/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 Jul 2018

Quantcast