Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Dyba

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda

Bishop of Germany, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1929BornBerlin
2 Feb 195929.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Aug 197949.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
25 Aug 197949.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gambia
25 Aug 197949.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Liberia
25 Aug 197949.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guinea
25 Aug 197949.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Sierra Leone
13 Oct 197950.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
1 Jun 198353.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fulda, Germany
4 Sep 198354.0InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany
30 Nov 199061.2AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
23 Jul 200070.9DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Dyba:
Archbishop Johannes Dyba (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013