Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Battista De Paoli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Australia

Titular Archbishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1934BornJeannette, PA, USA
18 Dec 196026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
23 Sep 198349.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lares
23 Sep 198349.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sri Lanka
20 Nov 198349.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lares
6 Feb 198853.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to South Africa
6 Feb 198853.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
17 Apr 199358.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
5 Mar 199459.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Namibia
5 Mar 199459.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Botswana
25 Jun 199459.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
18 Mar 199661.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
11 Nov 199763.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Japan
18 Dec 200470.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Australia
10 Oct 200773.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Australia

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Battista De Paoli:
Archbishop Ambrose Battista De Paoli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Australia

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013