Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Gianfranceschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1902Born
20 Jul 192422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
28 Jul 195351.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
28 Jul 195351.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
20 Sep 195351.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
3 Feb 195754.8AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
1 May 197674.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
28 May 197775.1RetiredBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 May 197775.1RetiredBishop of Sarsina, Italy
29 Jan 199188.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Gianfranceschi
Bishop Augusto Gianfranceschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast