Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Tricarico

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Sistroniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1927 BornGallipoli, Italy
6 Jan 195022.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 198759.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sistroniana
28 Feb 198759.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Singapore
28 Feb 198759.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Thailand
28 Feb 198759.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
28 Feb 198759.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
27 Apr 198759.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sistroniana
22 Dec 199063.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
26 Jul 199366.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
200274.4RetiredOfficial of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Alberto Tricarico:
Archbishop Alberto Tricarico (born ) Official Emeritus of State

Please contact the Archbishop through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,411
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013