Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ersilio Cardinal Tonini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1914Born
18 Apr 193722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
28 Apr 196954.7AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
28 Apr 196954.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Recanati, Italy
2 Jun 196954.8Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
22 Nov 197561.3AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna e Cervia, Italy
Dec 1988²74.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rimini, Italy
23 Sep 198975.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Rimini, Italy
27 Oct 199076.2RetiredArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
26 Nov 199480.3Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199480.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina
28 Jul 201399.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ersilio Tonini (VIAF: 41085543)
Ersilio Cardinal Tonini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCentovera di San Giorgio Piacentino, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained PriestPiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Death PlaceOpera Santa Teresa del Bambino Ges¨, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia
Buried Place (Original)Monumental, Cemetery, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia
Buried Place (Current)Below Sant’Andrea Chapel, Cathedral, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia

  • a priest for 76.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 466
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast