Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Robert Bacqué

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Gradisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1936 BornBordeaux, France
1 Oct 196630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
17 Jun 198851.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gradisca
17 Jun 198851.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sri Lanka
3 Sep 198852.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gradisca
7 Jun 199457.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
27 Feb 200164.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands
15 Dec 2011³75.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Robert Bacqué:
Archbishop François Robert Bacqué (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Netherlands

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Netherlands.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,813
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 31 Oct 2013