Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Furno

Deceased

Grand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1921BornBairo Canavese
25 Jun 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
1 Aug 197351.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abari
1 Aug 197351.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
16 Sep 197351.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Abari
25 Nov 197856.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
21 Aug 198260.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
15 Apr 199270.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
26 Nov 199472.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
26 Nov 199472.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 199574.0AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
29 Sep 199775.8AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
27 May 200482.4RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
24 Feb 200583.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
28 Mar 200684.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
10 May 200684.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
27 Jun 200785.5RetiredGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
9 Dec 201594.0DiedGrand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

MicroData Summary for Carlo Furno
Carlo Cardinal Furno (born , died ) Grand Master Emeritus of Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

  • a priest for 71.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Dec 2015
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 99, Page 830
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016