Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Blasco Francisco Collaço

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to South Africa

Titular Archbishop of Octava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1931 BornRaia, India
2 May 195422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Goa e Damão, India
23 Sep 197746.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Octava
23 Sep 197746.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
5 Nov 197746.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Octava
26 Jul 198251.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
28 Feb 199159.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Madagascar
28 Feb 199159.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Mauritius
14 May 199462.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
13 Apr 199664.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
24 May 200069.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
24 May 200069.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
24 May 200069.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Botswana
24 Jun 200069.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
24 Jun 200069.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
Aug 200675.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
Aug 200675.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
Aug 200675.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
Aug 200675.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
Aug 200675.2RetiredApostolic Delegate to Botswana

MicroData Summary for Blasco Francisco Collaço:
Archbishop Blasco Francisco Collaço (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of South Africa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to South Africa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015