Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Mattiazzo

Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1940 BornRottanova di Cavarzere
5 Jul 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
16 Nov 198545.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Virunum
16 Nov 198545.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
16 Nov 198545.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burkina Faso
16 Nov 198545.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Niger
14 Dec 198545.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Virunum
5 Jul 198949.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Padova {Padua}, Italy
18 Jul 201575.2RetiredBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mattiazzo:
Archbishop Antonio Mattiazzo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Padova {Padua}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 19 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jul 2015