Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gniezno

Archidioecesis Gnesnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wojciech Polak, Archbishop
  • Radosław Orchowicz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Józef Kowalczyk, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Henryk Józef Muszyński, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Territory Added: 7 June 1929
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 8,122 (3,137 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archidiecezja.pl/
  • Mailing Address: ul. Prymasa Jana Laskiego 7, 62-200 Gniezno, Polska
  • Telephone: (061)426.21.02
  • Fax: 426.21.05

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Gniezno
1000ErectedDiocese of Poznań Archdiocese of Gniezno (erected)
Diocese of Kraków (erected)
1140Territory LostArchdiocese of Gniezno
Archdiocese of Magdeburg
Diocese of Wollin (erected)
Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
16 July 1821UnitedArchdiocese of Gniezno
Diocese of Poznań
Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
1 May 1923Territory LostDiocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Apostolic Administration of Schneidemühl (erected)
28 January 1939Territory AddedArchdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań (Sanniki)
Archdiocese of Gniezno
7 June 1929Territory AddedArchdiocese of Poznań (Orzechowo and Pieczkowo) Archdiocese of Gniezno
12 November 1948SplitArchdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań Archdiocese of Gniezno
Archdiocese of Poznań
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Częstochowa (Bolesławiec (except Skomlin), Lututów (except Naramice), Wieruszów)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Czermin, Jarocin, Pleszew)
Diocese of Opole (Uszyce and Zdziechowice (in Gorzów Śląski))
Archdiocese of Poznań (Bralin, Kępno, Koźmin, Krotoszyn, Odolanów, Ołobok, Ostrów I, Ostrów II, Ostrzeszów)
Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze) (Błaszki, Kalisz I, Kalisz II, Koźminek, Stawiszyn, Złoczew)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Syców (except Poniatowice), Twardogóra, along with Cieszków, Gądkowice, and Trzebicko (in Milicz))
Diocese of Kalisz (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm) (Brusy, Chojnice, Czersk, Gniew, Kamień Krajeński, Kartuzy, Koronowo, Kościerzyna, Nowe, Osiek, Sierakowice, Skarszewy, Starogard Gdański, Świecie I, Świecie II, Tczew, Tuchola, Zabory, and Zblewo)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Wierzchucin Królewski and part of Fordon outside of Bydgoszcz)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (Bytów, Człuchów, Główczyce, Lębork, Łeba, and Łupawa)
Diocese of Pelplin (and Metropolitan from Gniezno)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm) (Bierzgłowo, Brodnica, Chełmno, Chełmza, Działdowo, Golub, Grudziądz, Lembarg, Lidzbark, Lubawa, Łasin, Nowe Miasto Lubawskie, Radzyń, Toruń I, Toruń II, and Wąbrzeźno)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Toruń-Podgórz)
Diocese of Toruń (erected)
24 February 2004Territory LostArchdiocese of Gniezno (Bydgoszcz I, Bydgoszcz II, Bydgoszcz III, Bydgoszcz IV, Bydgoszcz V, Kcynia, Łobżenica, Mrocza, Nakło, Szubin, Wyrzysk, and Wysoka)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (Złotów)
Diocese of Pelplin (Part of Koronowo, Sępólno Krajeńskie, and Wierzchucin)
Diocese of Bydgoszcz (erected)
23 March 2004Territory AddedArchdiocese of Poznań (Boundaries adjusted)
Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze) (Boundaries adjusted)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Boundaries adjusted)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Gniezno
1950753,746763,42498.7%304533572,11148616272ap1951
1970923,627929,54999.4%526926181,494143684283ap1971
1980961,101968,31299.3%573916641,447100616322ap1981
19901,086,9681,092,18199.5%643927351,478102589361ap1991
1999998,6691,024,77797.5%625987231,381134346326ap2000
2000999,7551,033,15196.8%633967291,371128347327ap2001
2001995,0031,023,35297.2%6381037411,342136368328ap2002
2002989,0851,019,36897.0%6301057351,345134365328ap2003
2003986,8801,022,48696.5%6351087431,328135359324ap2004
2004996,9621,015,90398.1%6401177571,316146368325ap2005
2006673,559678,84799.2%488515391,249121262266ap2007
2013656,716664,60898.8%490375271,24683223266ap2014
2016654,000672,00097.3%483335161,26769192266ap2017
2019644,000663,97597.0%460394991,29066179268ap2020
2021641,082661,97096.8%446394851,32162178268ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Gniezno
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210, and Page 211
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 227
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 287
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 347, to Page 348
  • Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 262, and Page 263
  • Archdiocese of Gniezno
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 21, Page 559
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 96, Page 241, and Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 19 Feb 2024