Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Olszowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1621Born
164523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
23 Feb 166140.0SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Aug 166140.5ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
26 Jun 167453.4SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Nov 167453.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
19 Oct 167554.7InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
29 Aug 167756.5DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Olszowski
Archbishop Andrzej Olszowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlschowa
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Church, Varsovie

  • a priest for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1661, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,799

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast