Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Latalski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1463¹Born
17 May 152562.3AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Mar 153673.2AppointedBishop of Krakˇw, Poland
17 Aug 153774.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
1540²77.0DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Latalski (VIAF: 24145304717078611251)
Archbishop Jan Latalski (born 1463, died 1540) Archbishop of Gniezno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1525, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast