Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Szembek

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
11 Jan 169039.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
11 Jan 169039.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
5 Mar 169039.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
21 Jun 170049.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
3 Nov 170554.8SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
7 Jun 170655.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Aug 172170.5DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Szembek (VIAF: 165884104)
Archbishop Stanisław Szembek (born 1651, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków
Ordained BishopVisitation, Church, Varsovie

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,857
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 7
  • unk: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 332, Page Not Available
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 356
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast