Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Jakub Wętkowski

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1963 Born
4 Jun 198824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
24 Nov 201249.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
24 Nov 201249.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Glavinitza
22 Dec 201249.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glavinitza
27 Apr 202157.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
7 Jun 202157.8InstalledBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Jakub Wętkowski
Bishop Krzysztof Jakub Wętkowski (born ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,616
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2021
  • i: CB, 1 May 2021
  • i: CB, 6 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Jun 2021

Quantcast