Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Francisco

Archidioecesis Sancti Francisci



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Salvatore Joseph Cordileone, Archbishop
  • William Joseph Justice, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Robert Walter McElroy, Auxiliary Bishop
  • George Hugh Niederauer, Archbishop Emeritus
  • John Raphael Quinn, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Ignatius Chung Wang, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 29 July 1853
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: California
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 6,023 (1,012 Square Miles)
  • Description: San Francisco, San Mateo, and Marin Counties.
  • Conference Region: XI (CA, HI, NV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SFR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.sfarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: One Peter Yorke Way, San Francisco, CA 94109
  • Telephone: (415)614-5500
  • Fax: 614-5555

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
29 July 1853ErectedDiocese of Monterey Archdiocese of San Francisco (erected)
27 September 1860Territory LostArchdiocese of San Francisco Vicariate Apostolic of Marysville (erected)
28 May 1886Territory LostDiocese of Grass Valley (suppressed)
Archdiocese of San Francisco
Diocese of Sacramento (erected)
1887Territory LostArchdiocese of San Francisco Vicariate Apostolic of Utah (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of San Francisco Diocese of Oakland (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of San Francisco Diocese of Santa Rosa in California (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Sacramento (Del Norte, Humboldt, Calaveras, Tuolumne, and Mono Counties)
Archdiocese of San Francisco (Solano County)
Diocese of Stockton (erected)
27 January 1981Territory LostArchdiocese of San Francisco Diocese of San Jose in California (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950650,0003,000,00021.7%4833968797397362,374194ap1951
1966812,1862,413,00033.7%3864828689356442,216153ap1967
1970842,7602,521,70033.4%3705218919456612,060151ap1971
1976596,4002,542,65523.5%38353691964897401,657153ap1977
1980630,2742,694,20023.4%428530958657113881,617153ap1981
1990395,0001,600,00024.7%295264559706383261,085104ap1991
1999422,0001,700,00024.8%227206433974524782593ap2000
2000422,5001,760,29924.0%1941993931,0757525881490ap2001
2001422,5001,760,30024.0%1941903841,1007224982390ap2002
2002425,2101,744,05024.4%1931733661,1617322682190ap2003
2003425,2101,744,05024.4%2471704171,0196722580090ap2004
2004425,2101,744,05024.4%2731524251,0006220380190ap2005
2010444,0081,850,03524.0%2551624171,0647920769590ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013