Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard John Garcia

Deceased

Bishop of Monterey in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1947Born
13 May 197326.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
27 Jan 198133.7IncardinatedPriest of San Jose in California, USA
25 Nov 199750.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
25 Nov 199750.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bapara
28 Jan 199850.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bapara
19 Dec 200659.6AppointedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
30 Jan 200759.7InstalledBishop of Monterey in California, USA
11 Jul 201871.2DiedBishop of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard John Garcia
Bishop Richard John Garcia (born , died ) Bishop of Monterey in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Church, San Jose, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained BishopBlessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Sacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California
Buried Place (Original)San Carlos, Cemetery, Monterey, Diocese of Monterey in California

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,231
  • d: CB, 11 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jul 2018

Quantcast