Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Christian, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Giru Marcelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1948Born
1970²21.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Oct 197122.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1974²25.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Jun 197627.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Mar 201869.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
28 Mar 201869.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
5 Jun 201869.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
11 Jul 201970.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Christian
Bishop Robert Francis Christian O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained BishopSaint Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Death PlaceResidence, St. Patrick's, Seminary, Menlo Park, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2018
  • ob: CB, 12 Apr 2018
  • c2: CB, 16 Apr 2018
  • c4: CB, 22 May 2018
  • c3: CB, 5 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,786
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast