Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph McGrath

Bishop of San Jose in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1945 Born
7 Jun 197024.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
6 Dec 198843.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
6 Dec 198843.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Allegheny
25 Jan 198943.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Allegheny
30 Jun 199853.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Jose in California, USA
17 Sep 199853.2InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of San Jose in California, USA
27 Nov 199954.4SucceededBishop of San Jose in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph McGrath
Bishop Patrick Joseph McGrath (born ) Bishop of San Jose in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Ireland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jose in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018