Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roland Pierre DuMaine

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Jose in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1931Born
15 Jun 195725.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Apr 197846.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Apr 197846.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarda
29 Jun 197846.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarda
27 Jan 198149.4AppointedBishop of San Jose in California, USA
18 Mar 198149.6InstalledBishop of San Jose in California, USA
27 Nov 199968.3ResignedBishop of San Jose in California, USA
13 Jun 201987.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Jose in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Roland Pierre DuMaine
Bishop Roland Pierre DuMaine (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Jose in California

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaducah
Death PlaceSunnyvale, Diocese of San Jose in California
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Plot, Gate of Heaven, Cemetery, Los Altos, Diocese of San Jose in California

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Jun 2019
  • d.loc: CB, 19 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast