Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Sadoc Alemany y Conill, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1814Born
11 Mar 183722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 May 185035.8AppointedBishop of Monterey, California, USA
30 Jun 185035.9Ordained BishopBishop of Monterey, California, USA
29 Jul 185339.0AppointedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
21 Dec 188470.4ResignedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
20 Mar 188570.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
14 Apr 188873.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sadoc Alemany y Conill (VIAF: 89497567)
Archbishop Joseph Sadoc Alemany y Conill O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVich, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Carlo au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 276, and Page 392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 445
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 868
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017