Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Joseph Prendergast

Deceased

Priest of San Francisco, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1834¹Born
29 Jun 185925.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 187541.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
20 Aug 187541.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
19 Jan 191480.0DiedPriest of San Francisco, California, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Prendergast
Father John Joseph Prendergast (born 1834, died ) Priest of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClogheen, Co. Tipperary, Ireland
Ordained PriestAll Hallows, College, Ireland

  • a priest for 54.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017