Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter James Muldoon

Deceased

Bishop of Rockford, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1862BornColumbia, CA
18 Dec 188624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Jun 190138.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Jun 190138.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
25 Jul 190138.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
28 Sep 190846.0AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
15 Dec 190846.2InstalledBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
22 Mar 191754.4AppointedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Oct 192765.0DiedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Peter James Muldoon:
Bishop Peter James Muldoon (born , died ) Bishop of Rockford

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/i/d: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011
  • ab: CB, 6 Dec 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 534
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1901, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013