Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Salt Lake City

Dioecesis Civitatis Lacus Salsi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Charles Wester, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Utah
1887ErectedArchdiocese of San Francisco Vicariate Apostolic of Utah (erected)
Diocese of Salt Lake
27 January 1891ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Utah (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Salt Lake (erected)
27 March 1931Territory LostDiocese of Salt Lake
Diocese of Sacramento
Diocese of Reno (erected)
Diocese of Salt Lake City
31 March 1951Name ChangedDiocese of Salt Lake Diocese of Salt Lake City

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Salt Lake
195023,392640,0003.7%3519544333817326ap1951
Diocese of Salt Lake City
196651,7691,003,0005.2%62421044976519435ap1967
197050,4831,063,0004.7%5244965256217636ap1971
197651,8151,207,0004.3%4142836246212138ap1977
198059,7441,367,0004.4%474491656226011039ap1981
199065,7191,715,0003.8%49419073024599543ap1991
199998,8002,591,0453.8%5432861,14840126043ap2000
2000103,8252,100,0004.9%5326791,31439375847ap2001
2001107,0002,130,0005.0%5628841,27343405247ap2002
2002120,0002,233,0005.4%5729861,39541415847ap2003
2003125,0002,295,9715.4%5825831,50644375447ap2004
2004150,0002,316,2566.5%5829871,72470415047ap2005
2010250,0002,736,4249.1%5723803,12571334048ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Apr 2013