Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick William Riordan

Deceased

Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1841Born
10 Jun 186523.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 188341.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
17 Jul 188341.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cabasa
16 Sep 188342.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cabasa
21 Dec 188443.3SucceededArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
27 Dec 191473.3DiedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick William Riordan (VIAF: 61244477)
Archbishop Patrick William Riordan (born , died ) Archbishop of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatham, Canada
Ordained BishopSt. James, Church, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017