Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert John Armstrong

Deceased

Bishop of Sacramento, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1884BornSan Francisco
10 Dec 191025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
4 Jan 192944.0AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
12 Mar 192944.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
14 Jan 195772.0DiedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert John Armstrong
Bishop Robert John Armstrong (born , died ) Bishop of Sacramento

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 20 Nov 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016