Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Honolulu

Dioecesis Honoluluensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 25 January 1941
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Francisco
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Hawaii
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 16,637 (6,426 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises all of the Hawaiian Islands
  • Conference Region: XI (CA, HI, NV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: HON
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholichawaii.org/
  • Mailing Address: 1184 Bishop Street, Honolulu, HI 96813, USA
  • Telephone: (808)585-3346
  • Fax: 537-1860

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sandwich Islands
24 October 1825ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Sandwich Islands (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sandwich Islands
3 August 1844ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sandwich Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Sandwich Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands
9 May 1848Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Sandwich Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands
Diocese of Honolulu
25 January 1941ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Honolulu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Honolulu
1950145,000525,00027.6%61191251,1608836755ap1951
1966220,000726,31030.3%251461711,28614748663ap1967
1970210,000807,50926.0%311311621,29623236266ap1971
1976205,000846,90024.2%461191651,24219441566ap1977
1980211,000902,00023.4%571121691,248118738364ap1981
1990225,0281,112,10020.2%71961671,3473215130267ap1991
1999236,6881,186,60219.9%69781471,610264818066ap2000
2000239,0001,196,00020.0%72881601,4932613715666ap2001
2001215,0001,185,49718.1%73821551,3873213815566ap2002
2002260,0001,211,53721.5%65851501,7335013516166ap2003
2003232,9351,211,53719.2%87811681,3865214520166ap2004
2004234,5881,244,89818.8%79781571,4945112523661ap2005
2006239,0001,270,00018.8%86771631,4664712119066ap2007
2013263,0001,325,00019.8%92611531,718609312566ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.5, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016