Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Justice

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1942 Born
17 May 196826.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
10 Apr 200865.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
10 Apr 200865.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
28 May 200866.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
16 Nov 201775.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Justice
Bishop William Joseph Justice (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrence, MA
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Francisco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,751
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast