Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph James Keane

Deceased

Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1872Born
20 Jun 189523.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
10 Sep 192048.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
10 Sep 192048.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
4 Dec 192048.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
17 Mar 192250.1AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
1 Sep 192856.6DiedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph James Keane
Bishop Patrick Joseph James Keane (born , died ) Bishop of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallybunnion, Ireland

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast