Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Randolph Roque Calvo

Bishop of Reno, Nevada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1950 BornAgana, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
21 May 197726.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
23 Dec 200555.3AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
17 Feb 200655.5Ordained BishopBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for Randolph Roque Calvo:
Bishop Randolph Roque Calvo (born ) Bishop of Reno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013