Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Aloysius Donohoe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fresno, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1905BornSan Francisco
14 Jun 193025.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
2 Aug 194742.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
2 Aug 194742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Taium
7 Oct 194742.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taium
27 Jan 196256.6AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
22 Aug 196964.2AppointedBishop of Fresno, California, USA
1 Jul 198075.0RetiredBishop of Fresno, California, USA
26 Oct 198782.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Hugh Aloysius Donohoe:
Bishop Hugh Aloysius Donohoe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fresno

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013