Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Thomas McGucken

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1902BornLos Angeles
15 Jan 192825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles-San Diego, California, USA
4 Feb 194138.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
4 Feb 194138.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanavus
19 Mar 194139.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanavus
26 Oct 195553.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
14 Jan 195754.8SucceededBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
19 Feb 196259.9AppointedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
3 Apr 196260.1InstalledArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
16 Feb 197774.9RetiredArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
26 Oct 198381.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Thomas McGucken:
Archbishop Joseph Thomas McGucken (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Francisco

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1941, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013