Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Mitty

Deceased

Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1884Born
22 Dec 190622.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192642.4AppointedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
8 Sep 192642.6Ordained BishopBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
29 Jan 193248.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
29 Jan 193248.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aegina
4 Feb 193248.0InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
2 Mar 193551.1SucceededArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
15 Oct 196177.7DiedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Mitty (VIAF: 4427195)
Archbishop John Joseph Mitty (born , died ) Archbishop of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017