Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Anthony Quinn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1921Born
15 Jun 194624.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Apr 197856.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Apr 197856.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Numana
29 Jun 197856.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numana
18 Dec 197958.2AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
18 Feb 198058.4InstalledBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
30 Nov 199372.2RetiredBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
21 Mar 201997.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Anthony Quinn (VIAF: 19276232)
Bishop Francis Anthony Quinn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles
Death PlaceSacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California

  • a priest for 72.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 Mar 2019

Quantcast