Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Harry Anselm Clinch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1908Born
6 Jun 193627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
5 Dec 195648.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
5 Dec 195648.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
27 Feb 195748.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae
16 Oct 196758.9AppointedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
14 Dec 196759.1InstalledBishop of Monterey in California, USA
19 Jan 198273.2ResignedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
8 Mar 200394.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Harry Anselm Clinch
Bishop Harry Anselm Clinch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael, CA

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast