Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Scanlan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1906Born
22 Jun 193024.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
8 Jul 195448.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
8 Jul 195448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
21 Sep 195448.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
10 Nov 196761.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
6 Mar 196861.7AppointedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
30 Jun 198175.0RetiredBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
31 Jan 199790.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Scanlan
Bishop John Joseph Scanlan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIniscarra Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017