Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Thomas O’Dowd

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California

Titular Bishop of Cea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1907BornSan Francisco
4 Jun 193224.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 194840.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
22 May 194840.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cea
29 Jun 194840.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cea
4 Feb 1950³42.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Thomas O’Dowd:
Bishop James Thomas O’Dowd (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013