Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tod David Brown

Bishop Emeritus of Orange in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1936 Born
1 May 196326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
27 Dec 198852.1AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
3 Apr 198952.3Ordained BishopBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
30 Jun 199861.6AppointedBishop of Orange in California, USA
3 Sep 199861.8InstalledBishop of Orange in California, USA
21 Sep 201275.8RetiredBishop of Orange in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Tod David Brown
Bishop Tod David Brown (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Orange in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orange in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,143
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast