Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grass Valley

Dioecesis Vallispratensis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Sacramento



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Marysville
27 September 1860ErectedArchdiocese of San Francisco Vicariate Apostolic of Marysville (erected)
Diocese of Grass Valley
22 March 1868ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Marysville Diocese of Grass Valley (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
28 May 1886SuppressedDiocese of Grass Valley (suppressed)
Archdiocese of San Francisco
Diocese of Sacramento (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 2 Apr 2012