Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Chung Wang

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Sitipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1934 Born
4 Jul 195925.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 200268.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
13 Dec 200268.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitipa
30 Jan 200368.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitipa
16 May 200975.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Chung Wang
Bishop Ignatius Chung Wang (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeking, China

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Francisco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast