Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Monterey in California

Dioecesis Montereyensis in California



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Richard John Garcia, Bishop
  • Sylvester Donovan Ryan, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 6 October 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Los Angeles
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: California
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 21,916 (8,475 Square Miles)
  • Description: Monterey, Santa Cruz, San Benito, and San Luis Obispo Counties.
  • Conference Region: XI (CA, HI, NV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: MRY
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofmonterey.org/
  • Mailing Address: 631 Abrego Street, P.O. Box 2048, Monterey, CA 93942-2048
  • Telephone: (831)373-4345
  • Fax: 373-1175

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of California (Two Californias, Both Californias)
27 April 1840ErectedDiocese of Sonora Diocese of California (Two Californias, Both Californias) (erected)
Diocese of Monterey
20 November 1849Name ChangedDiocese of California (Two Californias, Both Californias) Diocese of Monterey
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Monterey Archdiocese of San Francisco (erected)
29 July 1853Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Monterey (to San Francisco)
Diocese of Monterey-Los Angeles
7 July 1859Name ChangedDiocese of Monterey Diocese of Monterey-Los Angeles
1 June 1922SplitDiocese of Monterey-Los Angeles Diocese of Los Angeles-San Diego
Diocese of Monterey-Fresno
Diocese of Monterey-Fresno
1 June 1922SplitDiocese of Monterey-Los Angeles Diocese of Los Angeles-San Diego
Diocese of Monterey-Fresno
6 October 1967SplitDiocese of Monterey-Fresno Diocese of Fresno
Diocese of Monterey in California
Diocese of Monterey in California
6 October 1967SplitDiocese of Monterey-Fresno Diocese of Fresno
Diocese of Monterey in California

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Monterey
Diocese of Monterey-Los Angeles
Diocese of Monterey-Fresno
192450,0006083342dw
193379,0009979754dw
1946167,0001301,2841434365dw
195071,542187,76738.1%120461664307436773ap1951
1954300,7881,080,34827.8%2201,3676048099dw
1966431,7191,653,90026.1%186892751,56999606113ap1967
Diocese of Monterey in California
1970100,000500,00020.0%80491297757213243ap1971
197675,802379,00020.0%83391226216424543ap1977
198098,000498,00019.7%85311168445720343ap1981
1990163,500826,35019.8%98331311,24846716445ap1991
1999179,110895,55020.0%8117981,82735211746ap2000
2000295,660895,55033.0%89271162,54827411646ap2001
2001313,405949,30033.0%7120913,44426010847ap2002
2002315,902957,27933.0%86311172,70037010246ap2003
2003319,437967,99233.0%81231043,07135811246ap2004
2004193,598967,99220.0%93281211,59936713546ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013