Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Henry Elder

Deceased

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1819Born
29 Mar 184627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
9 Jan 185737.7AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
3 May 185738.1Ordained BishopBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
23 Jul 187859.3ResignedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
23 Jul 187859.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hauara
30 Jan 188060.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
4 Jul 188364.2SucceededArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
31 Oct 190485.6DiedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for William Henry Elder (VIAF: 3275944)
Archbishop William Henry Elder (born , died ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 205
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017