Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Joseph Hurley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa (in California), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1919Born
23 Sep 194424.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
21 Nov 196747.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
21 Nov 196747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
4 Jan 196848.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
19 Nov 196949.9AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
15 Apr 198666.3ResignedBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
5 Feb 200181.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa (in California), USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Joseph Hurley (VIAF: 44355557)
Bishop Mark Joseph Hurley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa (in California)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained PriestSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast