Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Moran

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1906Born
20 Jun 193125.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
15 Sep 196559.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
15 Sep 196559.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
13 Dec 196559.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
15 Jan 198175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
23 Aug 199690.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Moran
Bishop William Joseph Moran (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco, CA, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Ordained PriestSan Francisco, CA, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018