Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Arthur Sevilla, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Yakima, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1935 Born
3 Jun 196630.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Apr 197438.7Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Dec 198853.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
6 Dec 198853.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
25 Jan 198953.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina
31 Dec 199661.3AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
12 Apr 201175.6RetiredBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Carlos Arthur Sevilla
Bishop Carlos Arthur Sevilla S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Yakima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yakima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,037

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast