Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François-Alexandre de Jarente de Senas d’Orgeval

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1746BornSoissons
29 Oct 178034.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
11 Dec 178034.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
11 Dec 178034.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
18 Feb 178134.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
28 May 178841.9SucceededBishop of Orléans, France
22 Nov 179347.4ResignedBishop of Orléans, France
30 Oct 181064.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Alexandre de Jarente de Senas d’Orgeval:
Bishop Louis-François-Alexandre de Jarente de Senas d’Orgeval (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orléans

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015