Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin de la Saussaye

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Sep 1564AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
4 Mar 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
9 Feb 1584DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Mathurin de la Saussaye
Bishop Mathurin de la Saussaye (died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlois
Ordained BishopS. Mathurin, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,996
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast