Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de L’Aubespine

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
22 Aug 158346.6AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
1 Apr 158447.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
16 Mar 158851.2AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
23 Feb 159659.1DiedBishop of Orléans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de L’Aubespine
Bishop Jean de L’Aubespine (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrléans, Diocese of Orléans
Ordained BishopS. Victor, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222, and Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018